Lupin, Mark Howard (CPSO#: 59724)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: Lupinsky, Mark Howard (used until: 18 Oct 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990