Lurie, Arnold (CPSO#: 55195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4366
Fax: (905) 721-6180
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arnold Lurie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lurie ( CPSO# 55195 )

Business Address:
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 721-4366

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARNOLD LURIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LURIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Apr 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jan 2004
Summary:

 On January 6, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lurie to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Committee ordered and directed the following:

1)	that the 
 Registrar to suspend Dr. Lurie(s certificate of registration for a period of six 	months, 
 commencing January 6, 2004 at 11:59 p.m., three months of which will be 	suspended if Dr. Lurie 
 provides evidence to the College of his successful completion of 	the College boundaries 
 course;

2)	that Dr. Lurie attend before it to be reprimanded;

3)	that Dr. Lurie pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $2,800.00; and,

4)	the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
 register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 06, 2004