Lurie, Erin Michelle (CPSO#: 103069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St James Town Health Centre
1st Floor
410 Sherbourne St
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN MICHELLE LURIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LURIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 29 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018