Lusignan, Daniel Emery (CPSO#: 59600)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1748 Aspenview Way, Orleans, ON, K1C 6S3
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016