Lustgarten, Jacob J (CPSO#: 54086)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2005