Lusty, Avril Jane (CPSO#: 103098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
Empire 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVRIL JANE LUSTY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LUSTY is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. LUSTY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LUSTY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. LUSTY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LUSTY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LUSTY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018