Luterman, Maynard (CPSO#: 59109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: 9058716600 Ext. 33250
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 374-2966
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

7481 oakwood drive
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6S5
Canada
Phone: (289) 477-6011
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

318 ontario street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 682-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

90 Dundas Street
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H2
Canada
Phone: 9056901418
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 54088 )
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )
Dr. N. Jayawardene ( CPSO# 72587 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. N. Hoosen ( CPSO# 80356 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )
Dr. C. Che ( CPSO# 56739 )
Dr. J. Colorado ( CPSO# 74233 )
Dr. B. Dalgleish ( CPSO# 50321 )
Dr. K. Scher ( CPSO# 85889 )

Business Address:
7 - 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6600


Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 102753)
Dr. M. Al-Husari ( CPSO# 84859 )
Dr. L. Van Sittert ( CPSO# 77411 )
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kopp ( CPSO# 61467 )
Dr. W. Oelofse ( CPSO# 82011 )
Dr. R. Setrak ( CPSO# 81883 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. P. Kapend ( CPSO# 96224 )
Dr. M. Senechal ( CPSO# 91005 )
Dr. S. Mohajerani ( CPSO# 102800)
Dr. A. Graystone ( CPSO# 94103 )
Dr. D. Heywood ( CPSO# 99423 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYNARD LUTERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1987