Luterman, Rosalind Ann (CPSO#: 63817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
Suite 103
3400 Rue du Marche
Dollard des Ormeaux QC  H9B 2Y1
Phone: (514) 683-0414

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSALIND ANN LUTERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992