Lutynski, Andrzej (CPSO#: 66178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Apr 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Cancer Institute
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 15-108
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 4788
Fax: (416) 946-4530
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Apr 1993 to 28 May 1993
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2005

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2005 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Andrzej Lutynski may practise only as a Clinical Associate at the
                  Ontario Cancer Institute - Princess Margaret Hospital under the
                  supervision coordinated by Dr. A. Keating.  The treatment plan for each
                  patient must be approved by the attending staff physician(s) before
                  treatment is initiated. 

            2.    Dr. Lutynski may also practise medicine with the Temmy Latner Centre for
                  Palliative Care, Mount Sinai Hospital under the supervision coordinated
                  by the Director, Dr. S. Lawrence Librach.