Lutzak, Stephen Karim Terence (CPSO#: 61050)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Lutzak, Karim Terence Stephen (used until: 31 May 2004 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009