Luu, Lien Ngoc (CPSO#: 79439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Street Medical Centre
Suite 9
10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone: (905) 846-9911
Fax: (905) 846-9299
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1-7730 Kipling Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1Y9
Canada
Phone: (905) 850-0011
Fax: (905) 850-0013
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

14-9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lien Ngoc Luu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Luu ( CPSO# 79439 )

Business Address:
Main Street Medical Centre
9 - 10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Business Address:
1 - 7730 Kipling Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1Y9
Phone Number: (905) 850-0011

Business Address:
14 - 9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIEN NGOC LUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005