Luzzi, Carla Andrea (CPSO#: 105368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade do Extremo Sul Catarinense, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Room MCL2 - 405
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St., McL 2-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5118
Fax: 416-603-6494
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 12 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Carla  Andrea  Luzzi  may  practise medicine only as required by the
                  clinical fellowship program in anaesthesiology  in  which  Dr.  Luzzi  is
                  enrolled in the Department of Anaesthesia, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr.  Luzzi shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients of
                  a clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Luzzi is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are  regularly assigned by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Luzzi shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on December 31, 2018.