Lwin, Zarnie (CPSO#: 88099)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Insitute of Medicine I, Rangoon, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2008 to 12 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 13 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009