Lynch, Ciara Mary Ruth (CPSO#: 76037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Street Community Services
1002 Beaverbrook Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1L1
Phone: 613 831-6606
Fax: 613 831 7783
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CIARA MARY RUTH LYNCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003