Lynch, Johanne Claire (CPSO#: 90144)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 25 Feb 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 26 Feb 2009 to 02 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010