Lynch, Patrick Henry Pearse (CPSO#: 60510)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 2001