Lyon, David Craig (CPSO#: 60333)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist
General Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002