Lyons, Anthony William (CPSO#: 69338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Cresc.
P.O.Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: 705 435 3377
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANTHONY WILLIAM LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997