Lyons, Laura Myerling Isabel (CPSO#: 79048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health care London
Family Medical Centre
P.O. Box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 67237
Fax: (519) 672-7727
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.M.I. Lyons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lyons ( CPSO# 79048 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Family Medical
and Dental Centre
346 Platts Lane
London ON  N6G 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MYERLING ISABEL LYONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005