Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Lysikiewicz, Andrzej Josef (CPSO#: 52196)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2012