Lyttle, Alexander Joseph Wielhorski (CPSO#: 99604)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2012 to 14 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 2015 to 28 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2015