First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |