Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2001
Summary:
On April 16, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sandejas guilty of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise.
The Committee directed the following penalty:
(1) recorded reprimand;
(2) 18-months suspension, to commence no later than June 1, 2001, six-months of the suspension to be suspended provided Dr. Sandejas continues to receive care from a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar; and,
The Committee imposed the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Sandejas( certificate of registration:
(A) that Dr. Sandejas( practice be restricted to patients over the age of 16 years. The term to be removed upon Dr. Sandejas undergoing a forensic psychiatric assessment by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar and upon that psychiatrist providing a report to the Registrar indicating that Dr. Sandejas is within the lowest risk category for recurrence of sexual misconduct.
On May 8, 2001 the College appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court. On May 16, 2001, Dr. Sandejas cross appealed the decision to the Divisional Court.
On June 17, 2002, the College abandoned the appeal to the Divisional Court. On June 28, 2002, Dr. Sandejas abandoned his cross-appeal..
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 2002-06-28
Hearing Date(s): Oct 13, 2000