Ma, Jeffrey Curtis (CPSO#: 99150)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 19 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 08 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016