Ma, Jian (CPSO#: 92730)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 May 2010 to 08 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2010 to 29 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2010