Ma, Joanne Li Chang (CPSO#: 73969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 417, The Court
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 282-4242
Fax: (416) 282-3812
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ma ( CPSO# 73969 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
Suite 417
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 282-4242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE LI CHANG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004