Ma, Judy Pornnad (CPSO#: 62566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Burlington Medical Centre
Suite 18
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 319-2000
Fax: (905) 319-6292
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY PORNNAD MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991