Ma, Mona (CPSO#: 63998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Medical Centre
Suite 200
15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 727-9481
Fax: (905) 727-6280
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mona Ma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ma ( CPSO# 63998 )

Business Address:
200 - 15017 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1M5
Phone Number: (905) 727-9481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992