Ma, Patrick Chi-Chung (CPSO#: 68139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Medical Center Drive
P.O. Box 9300
West Virginia University
Morgantown WV  26506
United States
Phone: (304) 293-4229 Ext. 2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - West Virginia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK CHI-CHUNG MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006