Ma, Peter Chee Kin (CPSO#: 65295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UNIT 604
NEW WORLD TOWER, TOWER 1
18 QUEEN'S ROAD CENTRAL
Hong Kong
Hong Kong 0
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852+31682102

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHEE KIN MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993