Ma, Tony Kwok Fai (CPSO#: 67056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hong Kong Sanatorium and Hosp
Department of Pathology
2 Village Road Happy Valley
Hong Kong SAR
Hong Kong NA
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 28358839
Fax: 28346392

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONY KWOK FAI MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997