Ma, Tze Yuen (CPSO#: 66986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3461 Dixie Road
Suite 501
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3X4
Phone: (905) 212-9750
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TZE YUEN MA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 28 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997