Maarse, Miriam Jennifer (CPSO#: 93068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: Burns, Miriam Jennifer (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

LifeSource Medical Centre
2130 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 5Z1
Canada
Phone: 613-828-3122
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rappaport ( CPSO# 28272 )
Dr. D. Burns ( CPSO# 97552 )
Dr. M. Maarse ( CPSO# 93068 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-8999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM JENNIFER MAARSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAARSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014