Mac Con, Kieran Sylvester (CPSO#: 29431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MacKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905 883 1212
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 15 May 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIERAN SYLVESTER MAC CON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAC CON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977