Mac Con, Roderick Peter (CPSO#: 25318)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Maccon, Roderick Peter (used until: 17 Dec 1990 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 12 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006