Mac Diarmid, Donald John (CPSO#: 58184)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Islington Medical Center
4 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke ON  M9A 5C9
Phone: (416) 234-1987
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD JOHN MAC DIARMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAC DIARMID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 13 Jun 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 21 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 28, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. MacDiarmid(s guilty plea and found him 
 guilty in that he has been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise.

On 
 March 30, 2001, the Discipline Committee directed the following penalty:

(1) that Dr. 
 MacDiarmid(s certificate of registration be suspended for five months, to commence          on a 
 date to be fixed by the Registrar.

The Committee directs the Registrar to impose on Dr. 
 MacDiarmid(s certificate of registration the following terms:

(a) that Dr. MacDiarmid continue in 
 psychotherapy treatment for a period of at least two years;
(b) Dr. MacDiarmid may not submit 
 accounts to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (OHIP) for an        integral of three years 
 following the end of the suspension order.  And,  will advise the                  Registrar of 
 when he resumes submitting accounts to OHIP.

(2) the Registrar is directed to monitor Dr. 
 MacDiarmid(s OHIP billings for a period of three             years thereafter;

(3) $1,000 in 
 costs awarded to the College.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Jan 2003
Hearing Date(s): Feb 28, 2001