MacArthur, Ian Robert (CPSO#: 102212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
March School House 2
895 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone: (613) 591-1099
Fax: (613) 591-1077
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

350 John St. North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2B6
Canada
Phone: 613-623-2100
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian R. MacArthur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. MacArthur ( CPSO# 102212)

Business Address:
March School House 2
895 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 1X7
Phone Number: (613) 591-1099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN ROBERT MACARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016