MacAskill, Kimberly Ruth (CPSO#: 68831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: Ibbotson, Kimberly Ruth (used until: 29 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Westend Family Care Clinic
Family Health Team
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly MacAskill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. MacAskill ( CPSO# 68831 )

Business Address:
Westend Family Care Clinic
Family Health Team
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Kanata ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY RUTH MACASKILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACASKILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 24 Nov 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1997