MacBride, Ajana Patrice (CPSO#: 79111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlington Community Health Centre
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone: (613) 722-2161
Fax: (613) 722-8471
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJANA PATRICE MACBRIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACBRIDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2005