MacCallum, Johnstone Scott (CPSO#: 43598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone: (519) 824-6000 Ext. 4290
Fax: (519) 767-4165
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. MacCallum, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maccallum ( CPSO# 43598 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Phone Number: (519) 824-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 28 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHNSTONE SCOTT MACCALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACCALLUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2003