MacCormick, Ronald Eric (CPSO#: 51062)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2005