MacDonald, Christine Anne (CPSO#: 82978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33200
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christine Anne MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. MacDonald ( CPSO# 82978 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007