MacDonald, Donald Scott (CPSO#: 65610)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: Macdonald, Donald Scott (used until: 16 Oct 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 1999 to 05 Mar 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2003