MacDonald, James Andrew (CPSO#: 55426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Huston St
Burks Falls ON  P0A 1C0
Phone: 705-382-4020
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

46B King William Street
Huntsville ON  P1H 1G3
Canada
Phone: (705) 787-0444
Fax: (705) 787-0446
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macdonald ( CPSO# 55426 )

Business Address:
150 Huron Street
Burks Falls ON  P0A 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 382-4020

Business Address:
46B King William Street
Huntsville ON  P1H 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 787-0444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ANDREW MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1986