MacDonald, James Kerry (CPSO#: 58832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laboratory Director
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2480
Fax: (807) 468-3050
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kerry MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacDonald ( CPSO# 58832 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
2nd Floor
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES KERRY MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000