MacDonald, John Kelly Martin (CPSO#: 53402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2509
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KELLY MARTIN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 31 Dec 1986
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2004