MacDonald, Kelly Sigrid (CPSO#: 67113)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Manitoba Room 543 745 Bannatyne Avenue Winnipeg MB R3E 0J9
Date Received: 05 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017