MacDonald, Maria Jill (CPSO#: 84332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancerprogram
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA JILL MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011