MacDonald, Peter Hugh (CPSO#: 54373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St.
Burr 2 - Room 058
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7662
Fax: (613) 548-2500
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.H. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. MacDonald ( CPSO# 54373 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Burr 2 - 058
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HUGH MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Aug 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985