MacDonald, Scott MacKenzie (CPSO#: 74826)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2005 to 04 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2005